Gonzalez v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sue Gonzalez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00685
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the following pre-trial schedule: - Initial disclosures will be served by June 19, 2020. - Any joinder of parties or amended pleadings due by July 3, 2020. - Discovery or deposition of fact witnesses and independent medical exams will be completed by April 2, 2021. - A damages analysis is due by December 4, 2020. - Designation of experts and expert disclosures on any issues that parties bear the burden of proof are due by December 4, 2020. Any depositions of such experts will be completed by February 19, 2021. - Designation of experts and expert disclosures on any issues that parties do not bear the burden of proof are due by January 29, 2021. Any depositions of such experts will be completed by April 16, 2021. - Expert discovery, including any deposition of expert witnesses, shall be completed by April 16, 2021. - A post-discovery telephonic status conference will take place on April 22, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at (203) 579-5562. - Dispositive motions are due by May 21, 2021. - Joint trial memorandum is due thirty days after discovery, or thirty days after the Court rules on any dispositive motion. - Trial ready date is thirty days after the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/2/2020.(Garcia, A.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blumberg, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc..(Blumberg, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. Updated Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
May 21, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/2/2020. (Perez, J.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Blumberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. re #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance, #10 Notice (Other), #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other) Of Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Blumberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Blumberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2020. Discovery due by 11/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership of Pending Motions (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Inc. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5861378, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Gonzalez
Represented By: James M Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?