Gerald Metals, LLC v. Davidson et al
Petitioner: Gerald Metals, LLC
Respondent: Windrose Trading LLC and Gregory Davidson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00686
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT (Memorandum of Law in Support of Amended Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) by Gerald Metals, LLC re #7 Amended Complaint. (Lennon, Kevin)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against Gregory Davidson, Windrose Trading LLC, filed by Gerald Metals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Award, #2 Exhibit Services Agreement)(Lennon, Kevin)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Gerald Metals, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Gerald Metals, LLC, #3 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 5/18/2020.(Reis, Julia)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Lennon on behalf of Gerald Metals, LLC (Lennon, Kevin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/15/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/15/2020.(Reis, Julia)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 15, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award) against Gregory Davidson, Windrose Trading LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5861494.), filed by Gerald Metals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit Final Award)(Lennon, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald Metals, LLC v. Davidson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Windrose Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald Metals, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?