Communications Gateway Co., Ltd. v. Gartner, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Communications Gateway Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Craig Warren Safian, Eugene A Hall and Gartner, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00700
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Sayan Atthaworadej filed by Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Derek Seow filed by Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Zeitlin, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian.Responses due by 8/7/2020 (Zeitlin, Andrew)
June 19, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/27/2020. (Perez, J.)
June 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to July 17, 2020. (Leon, Noel)
June 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time until July 17, 2020 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/13/2020. (Leon, Noel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 17, 2020 to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gartner, Inc. (Zeitlin, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph DiMarco on behalf of Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian (DiMarco, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Zeitlin on behalf of Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian (Zeitlin, Andrew)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Communications Gateway Co., Ltd.. All Defendants. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gartner, Inc, Eugene A Hall, Craig Warren Safian* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aaron Davis Rosenberg* *Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green* *28 State Street, 22nd Floor* *Boston, MA 02109*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Communications Gateway Co., Ltd., #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Communications Gateway Co., Ltd. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2020. Discovery due by 11/20/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Communications Gateway Co., Ltd.. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5870281.), filed by Communications Gateway Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Communications Gateway Co., Ltd. v. Gartner, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Warren Safian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene A Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gartner, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communications Gateway Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Aaron Davis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?