In re: Moore
Appellee: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, MEB Loan Trust IV, MERCORP Holdings Inc, U.S. Trustee, Towd Point Master Funding Trust, Roberta Napolitano, The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York, Bank of New York Mellon and Bank of New York
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
Appellant: Johnny Ray Moore
Case Number: 3:2020cv00705
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 30 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Confirmation Hearing and Dismissal of Case. Held on 1/16/2020 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Phyllis P. Corella. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 28 Transmission of Amended Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 27 CORRECTED AMENDED NOTICE of Compliance by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 26 Amended Designation of Items by Johnny Ray Moore re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal to be included in Record on Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE of Compliance by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to the Appellee's Motion to Dismiss by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.Responses due by 7/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(St. Pierre, Linda)
June 26, 2020 Filing 22 ***ENTERED IN ERROR - SEE DOC. 23*** First MOTION to Dismiss by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association.Responses due by 7/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(St. Pierre, Linda) Modified on 6/29/2020 (Imbriani, Susan).
June 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Reconsideration of # 18 Scheduling Order for Filing Appellant's Brief by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order finding as moot #12 Motion to Strike in light of the subsequently filed #13 Amended Motion to Strike and denying #13 Amended Motion to Strike. A motion to strike the appearance of an attorney is not the appropriate procedural mechanism for challenging the standing of the attorney's client. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/19/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, and Bankruptcy Appeal Record having been received by this Court, the following briefing schedule is hereby entered: The Appellant's brief is due on or before July 20, 2020. The Appellee's brief is due on or before August 20, 2020. The Appellant's reply brief is due on or before September 3, 2020. The Appellant is on notice that failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal of this appeal without further notice from the Court. Fed. R. Bankruptcy P. 8018(a)(4). Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/18/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE: A record on appeal in the above-entitled matter was transmitted to the District Court by the US Bankruptcy Court on 6/18/2020 and entered on the docket on 6/18/2020 pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules. The Appellant and Appellee shall serve and file their briefs pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018. Appellant Brief due by 7/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Confirmation Hearing and Dismissal of Case, Held on 1/16/2020 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Phyllis P. Corella. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED MOTION to Strike #11 Notice of Appearance by Linda J. St. Pierre by Johnny Ray Moore, Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Fanelle, N.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #11 Notice of Appearance by Linda J. St. Pierre by Johnny Ray Moore, Responses due by 7/6/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda J. St. Pierre on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (St. Pierre, Linda)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Appearance Self Represented Party by Johnny Ray Moore. (Fanelle, N.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by U.S. Trustee - Notice of Non-Participation of William K. Harrington, United States Trustee, (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Crook on behalf of Roberta Napolitano (Crook, Patrick)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: A notice of appeal was filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 5/21/2020. The notice of appeal was transmitted to the U.S. District Court by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court and entered on the docket on 5/21/2020 pursuant to the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure ("Bankruptcy Rules"). The Appellant and Appellee shall comply with the deadlines set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8009 for the filing of the designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal ("designation") and a statement of the issues to be presented ("statement of issues") in the Bankruptcy Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(1)(B). As an alternative to filing a designation, the parties may jointly prepare an agreed statement of the record on appeal, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d) ("joint statement of record on appeal"). The briefs filed by the Appellant and Appellee shall comport with all of the requirements of the Bankruptcy Rules, including the filing deadlines set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8018. The Appellant must serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the docketing of notice by the clerk that the record has been transmitted to this Court or is available electronically. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018(a)(1). Failure to comply with this Order or the deadlines set forth in Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B) regarding the filing of the designation and statement of issues may result in dismissal of the appeal without further notice from the Court. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/21/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/21/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-51257, filed by Johnny Ray Moore. (Attachments: #1 Bankrupcy Memorandum of Decision, #2 Bankruptcy Order Denying Motion) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Linda J. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Saul O Leopold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MEB Loan Trust IV
Represented By: David A. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERCORP Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Holley Longshore Claiborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Towd Point Master Funding Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Roberta Napolitano
Represented By: Patrick Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Johnny Ray Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?