Lindsay v. University of Connecticut Health Center et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Lindsay
Defendant: University of Connecticut Health Center, Corrigan Medical Staff, Omprakash Pillia and Corrigan Correctional Staff
Case Number: 3:2020cv00707
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Kevin Lindsay (Payton, R.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT A Acknowledgement by Kevin Lindsay re #3 Standing Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Fanelle, N.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency. You must submit the $400.00 filing fee or the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S. mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/16/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 5/26/20.(Payton, R.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/21/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Corrigan Correctional Staff, Corrigan Medical Staff, Omprakash Pillia, University of Connecticut Health Center, filed by Kevin Lindsay.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay v. University of Connecticut Health Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Connecticut Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrigan Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omprakash Pillia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrigan Correctional Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?