Soto v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angelica Soto
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc and Wal-Mart Associates, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00714
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE. In light of Plaintiff's #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is hereby DISMISSED, as stipulated, "without prejudice, against all named [D]efendants." Doc. 16, at 1. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 29, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Angelica Soto (Rossetti, Amita)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER. As a result of the Court's previous Order, see Doc. 14, Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Request to Revise is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court notes that Plaintiff also filed her motion "[p]ursuant to [the] Practice Book," and that any future motions must comply with--and responsive deadlines are governed by--the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this District's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 27, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER. Defendants' #8 Request to Revise is DENIED. Defendants have filed their motion "[p]ursuant to Practice Book 10-35." Doc. 8, at 1. However, the Connecticut Practice Book governs, inter alia, the procedure in civil matters in Connecticut's superior courts. Defendants have removed this action to federal court, and therefore they must file their motion in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this District's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Cf., e.g., Davis v. Globe Life & Acc. Ins. Co., No. 12 Civ. 1583 (VLB), 2013 WL 5436907, at *1 n.1 (D. Conn. Sept. 27, 2013) (concluding that a party's argument regarding Connecticut Practice Book 10-35 was "irrelevant" because the lawsuit was "proceeding in federal court pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, not the Connecticut Practice Book"). The Court will consider any future motion that is properly filed in accordance with such Rules. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 27, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amita P. Rossetti on behalf of Angelica Soto (Rossetti, Amita)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days to Respond and/or Object to Defendant's Request to Revise #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Angelica Soto, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #1 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc Signed by Clerk on 05/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 05/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2020 Discovery due by 11/21/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2020 Signed by Clerk on 05/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 22, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days to Respond and/or Object to Defendant's Request to Revise by Angelica Soto. (Hushin, Z.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Revise Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc.Responses due by 6/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hushin, Z.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc (Blumberg, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc identifying Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership; Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. for Walmart Inc. (Springer, George)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Springer, George)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
May 22, 2020 Filing fee received from Springer, Georce C., Jr.: $ 400.00, receipt number ACTDC-5872779 (Hushin, Z.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of Waterbury, case number UWY-CV20-6054730-S., filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hushin, Z.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc. (Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Soto
Represented By: Tavis O. Tindall
Represented By: Amita P. Rossetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?