Palmer v. Radius Global Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carissa Palmer
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Radius Global Solutions LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00722
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The #7 stipulation of dismissal is APPROVED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/23/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of case by Carissa Palmer. (Deutsch, Raphael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Radius Global Solutions LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Raphael Deutsch* *Stein Saks PLLC* *285 Passaic St.* *Hackensack, NJ 07601*. (Peterson, M)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Carissa Palmer, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/27/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/26/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/26/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2020. Discovery due by 11/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/26/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 26, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
May 26, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Radius Global Solutions LLC. (Deutsch, Raphael)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does, Radius Global Solutions LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5878017.), filed by Carissa Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Deutsch, Raphael) Modified on 5/27/2020 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Radius Global Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Palmer
Represented By: Raphael Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?