Freundlich v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marc Allen Freundlich
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00726
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting on consent #11 Motion for Extension of Time to September 8, 2020 to file the administrative transcript. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/21/2020. (Watson, M.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/8/2020 to file electronic certified administrative record by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fitzhugh, Nicol)
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consented to Motion for Correction of Clerical Error in Case Caption. The Clerk shall change the defendant in the case caption to Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/24/2020. (Watson, M.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Correction of Clerical Error and for Order Directing the Clerk to change Case Caption Order by Marc Allen Freundlich. (Katz, Ivan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill, Marc Allen Freundlich. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/28/2020.(Anastasio, F.)
May 28, 2020 Filing fee received from Ivan Katz: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXN00021426 (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/2020.(Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice re: Consent to Magistrate Judge by Marc Allen Freundlich (Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Marc Allen Freundlich (Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Marc Allen Freundlich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia)
May 26, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Nancy A. Berryhill to 7/25/2020. (Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freundlich v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Allen Freundlich
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?