Universitas Education, LLC v. Benistar et al
Plaintiff: Universitas Education, LLC
Defendant: Benistar, Donald Trudeau, Grist Mill Partners, LLC, Phoenix Charitable Trust, Jane Doe Entities Under Control of Judgment Debtors, Carpenter Charitable Trust, Benistar Administrative Services, Inc., Moonstone Partners, LLC, Atlantic Charitable Trust, TPG Group, Inc., Jane Doe Entities Under Control of Molly Carpenter and/or Donald Trudeau, Avon Charitable Trust, Alliance Charitable Trust, Molly Carpenter, Jane Doe, Benistar Admin Services, Inc. and TPG Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00738
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; finding as moot #15 Motion for Disclosure in light of the Stipulation for Prejudgment Attachment of Real Estate (Doc. Nos. 65-66). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/20/2020. (Watson, M.)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON THE STIPULATION #65 filed by Universitas Education, LLC: In accordance with the Stipulation for Prejudgment Attachment of Real Estate, the parties' Order of Attachment is SO ORDERED (see attached). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/20/2020.(Watson, M.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 65 STIPULATION for Prejudgment Attachment of Real Estate by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Description of Property at 100 Grist Mill Road, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Description of Property at 18 Pond Side Lane, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Description of Property at 392B Cards Pond Road)(Manson, Joseph)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Telephonic Status Conference: In accordance with the discussion during today's telephonic status conference regarding a resolution of the PJR by stipulation, the parties shall submit a proposed order for the Court's consideration on or before July 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 7/13/2020.(Watson, M.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/13/2020. 14 minutes (Watson, M.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy (Plaintiff's Brief in Further Support of Application for Prejudgment Remedy and Motion for Disclosure of Assets) filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Caldwell, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Grist Mill Partners, LLC to 7/31/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2020 for Defendant Grist Mill Partners, LLC to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/30/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 29, 2020 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2020 for Defendant Grist Mill Partners, LLC to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Grist Mill Partners, LLC. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 59 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt) served on Phoenix Charitable Trust on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 58 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt) served on Carpenter Charitable Trust on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 57 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt) served on Atlantic Charitable Trust on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 56 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt) served on Alliance Charitable Trust on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 55 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt) served on Avon Charitable Trust on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 54 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Service for documents referenced in Summons Returned Executed (postal return receipt ) served on Grist Mill Partners, LLC on 06/09/2020, filed by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 53 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy filed by Grist Mill Partners, LLC. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/13/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM of Telephonic Status Conference Regarding the Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Remedy: As discussed during the telephonic conference call held today, the following deadlines were set: (1) the plaintiff shall file its response to the defendants' opposition by July 7, 2020; (2) the parties shall file their proposed exhibit and witness lists by July 17, 2020; (3) the parties shall submit (electronically) copies of their premarked exhibits to Chambers and Judge Spector's Courtroom Deputy by July 24, 2020; (4) a telephonic status conference will be held on July 13, 2020 at 3:00 p.m.; and (5) the hearing on the plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Remedy will be held by video-conference on July 29, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. and, if necessary, for a half day on July 30, 2020.(Watson, M.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Continue the PJR Hearing to July 29, 2020. The hearing will commence by video-conference on July 29, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. and, if necessary, will continue for half a day on July 30, 2020, starting at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/26/2020. (Watson, M.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/26/2020. 30 minutes (Watson, M.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 48 OBJECTION re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy filed by Benistar Admin Services, Inc., Molly Carpenter, Moonstone Partners, LLC, TPG Group Inc, Donald Trudeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2, #4 Exhibit A3, #5 Exhibit A4, #6 Exhibit A5, #7 Exhibit A6, #8 Errata B)(McPherson, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Benistar Admin Services, Inc. to 7/30/2020; Molly Carpenter to 7/30/2020; Moonstone Partners, LLC to 7/30/2020; TPG Group Inc to 7/30/2020; Donald Trudeau to 7/30/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2020 To Plead with Consent. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/25/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 24, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 30, 2020 To Plead with Consent by Benistar Admin Services, Inc., Molly Carpenter, Moonstone Partners, LLC, TPG Group Inc, Donald Trudeau. (McPherson, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Prejudgment Remedy to July 29, 2020 with Consent by Grist Mill Partners, LLC. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Grist Mill Partners, LLC (Grossman, Lawrence)
June 19, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Grist Mill Partners, LLC (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ORDER VACATING ORDER TO STRIKE DOCUMENTS WRONGFULLY SERVED ON CLERK OF COURT (Doc. # 36 ). In light of the supplemental notice filed by plaintiff stating that defendant Avon Charitable Trust has been served with process (Doc. #37 ; see also Doc. #25 at 10-11), the Court hereby VACATES its order striking documents served on Clerk of Court on the ground that the Court was mistaken concerning the premise for its order. The Clerk shall not discard the documents filed by plaintiff pursuant to Rule 5(b)(2)(D) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/16/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
June 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Universitas Education, LLC Concerning Service of Documents on Avon Charitable Trust and Court's Order Striking Documents (Caldwell, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS WRONGFULLY SERVED ON CLERK OF COURT. Plaintiff has filed documents with the Clerk of Court along with a Notice Concerning Service of Documents on Avon Charitable Trust, a party that has not yet been served with process or entered an appearance in this action. Doc. #30 . Plaintiff states that Avon Charitable Trust has no known address and relies on Rule 5(b)(2)(D) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as grounds to effectuate service on Avon Charitable Trust simply by delivering process to the Clerk of Court. A party may not use Rule 5(d)(2)(B) to evade the initial service-of-process requirements set forth under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See, e.g., Reid v. Dan Yant, Inc., 2018 WL 8014197, at *2-3 (E.D.N.Y. 2018); Cryer v. UMass Med. Corr. Health, 2011 WL 841248, at *1 (D. Mass. 2011). Accordingly, the Court STRIKES the documents served on the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of Court may discard these documents absent immediate request by plaintiff to come to the courthouse to retrieve them. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/12/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A TELEPHONIC Status Conference is set for 6/26/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Counsel shall use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM of Status Conference Regarding Motion for Prejudgment Remedy: As discussed during the telephonic status conference held today, the defendants will file their brief in opposition to the plaintiff's motion by June 26, 2020. An evidentiary hearing on the Motion for Prejudgment Remedy is set for July 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. and will be held by video-conference. A follow-up telephonic status conference is set for June 26, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/12/2020.(Watson, M.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/12/2020. 17 minutes (Watson, M.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. McPherson on behalf of Benistar Admin Services, Inc., Molly Carpenter, Moonstone Partners, LLC, TPG Group Inc, Donald Trudeau (McPherson, Michael)
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Avon Charitable Trust* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael G. Caldwell* *Barclay Damon, LLP* *545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Pesta, J.) Modified on 6/25/2020 (Pesta, J.).
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TPG Group Inc. (LaBelle, Dan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moonstone Partners, LLC. (LaBelle, Dan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benistar Admin Services, Inc.. (LaBelle, Dan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan E. LaBelle on behalf of Benistar Admin Services, Inc., Molly Carpenter, Moonstone Partners, LLC, TPG Group Inc, Donald Trudeau (LaBelle, Dan)
June 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE Re: Universitas Education, LLC could not establish an address for service upon Phoenix Charitable Trust. They delivered copies of filings 1-20 to the Clerk's Office pursuant to Fed Rule 5(b)(2)(D). (Pesta, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE Re: Universitas Education, LLC could not establish an address for service upon Atlantic Charitable Trust. They delivered copies of filings 1-20 to the Clerk's Office pursuant to Fed Rule 5(b)(2)(D). (Pesta, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE Re: Universitas Education, LLC could not establish an address for service upon Carpenter Charitable Trust. They delivered copies of filings 1-20 to the Clerk's Office pursuant to Fed Rule 5(b)(2)(D). (Pesta, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE Re: Universitas Education, LLC could not establish an address for service upon Alliance Charitable Trust. They delivered copies of filings 1-20 to the Clerk's Office pursuant to Fed Rule 5(b)(2)(D). (Pesta, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE Re: Universitas Education, LLC could not establish an address for service upon Avon Charitable Trust. They delivered copies of filings 1-20 to the Clerk's Office pursuant to Fed Rule 5(b)(2)(D). (Pesta, J.) (Pesta, J.) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (Pesta, J.).
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Universitas Education, LLC. Alliance Charitable Trust served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Atlantic Charitable Trust served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Avon Charitable Trust served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Benistar Admin Services, Inc. served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Molly Carpenter served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Carpenter Charitable Trust served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Grist Mill Partners, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Moonstone Partners, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Phoenix Charitable Trust served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; TPG Group Inc served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020; Donald Trudeau served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 7, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Status Conference Regarding the Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Remedy is set for 6/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial in for this call: 877-873-8017, access code: 7040261. (Watson, M.)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: On June 1, 2020, the plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Motion for Prejudgment Remedy (Doc. No. 9) and Motion for Disclosure of Assets (Doc. No. 15). On June 2, 2020, the Court (Meyer, J) referred the motions to the undersigned. (Doc. No. 17). On June 3, 2020, the plaintiff filed a Notice regarding the pending motions in which the plaintiff emphasizes its position as set forth in its Ex Parte Motion for Prejudgment Remedy, and requests an ex parte oral argument. (Doc. No. 21).Under Connecticut's "prejudgment remedies law, prejudgment remedies can only be issued ex parte in certain limited circumstances, which include exigent circumstances." Cendant Corp. v. Shelton, 473 F. Supp. 2d 307, 321 (D. Conn. 2007) (citing Conn. Gen. Stat. 52-278e). The plaintiff asserts that exigent circumstances, as detailed in 52-278e, exist in this case as the defendants are "about to fraudulently dispose of or [have] fraudulently disposed of any of [their] property with intent to hinder, delay or defraud [the defendants'] creditors" or have "fraudulently hidden or withheld money, property or effects which should be liable to the satisfaction of [their] debts." (See Doc. No. 9, Ex. A). The plaintiff asserts that the judgment debtors in this dispute are indebted to the plaintiff for approximately $46.7 million, plus continued post-judgment interest, and Daniel Carpenter is personally indebted for approximately $26 million, plus continued post-judgment interest. (Doc. No. 9-1 at 6; Doc. No. 9-2 at 5). The plaintiff discusses the past fraudulent acts of Daniel and Molly Carpenter which have been done with an intent to frustrate the plaintiff's ability to enforce its judgment. (Doc. No. 9-1 at 6-8). Additionally, the plaintiff argues that prior cases involving defendant Benistar demonstrate a pattern whereby Benistar entities frequently transfer and/or assign assets to other Benistar entities with an intent to hinder, delay, or otherwise defraud creditors. (Doc. No. 9-1 at 7). The plaintiff seeks to attach two properties to secure its likely judgment: one belonging to defendant Grist Mill Partners, LLC, which is an entity controlled by Daniel Carpenter (Doc. No. 9-1 at 7), valued at $2.4 million and the other, belonging to defendant Molly Carpenter, valued at $430,780. (Doc. No. 9-2 at 5). The plain language of 52-278e requires a reasonable likelihood that the defendants against whom the prejudgment remedy is sought, will remove assets from the state. The plaintiff has not established a reasonable likelihood that all of the named defendants in this case should be subject to an ex parte prejudgment remedy. Moreover, any emergency or exigent basis on which to consider this application has been mooted by the long litigation history against these defendants, and involving related individuals and entities, and the fact that these defendants have had notice of attempted collection through litigation in multiple forums. As the plaintiff states, "[t]his is not a new dispute." (Doc. No. 21 at 1). The arbitration award that this plaintiff is attempting to collect was issued in 2011, the Southern District of New York issued a judgment affirming that award in 2012, and the Second Circuit affirmed that decision. The judgment debtors' continuous fraudulent transfer of assets with an intent to frustrate the plaintiff's collection efforts is well established and the plaintiff has not established how exigent circumstances suddenly exist. Accordingly, to the extent that the plaintiff seeks a prejudgment remedy on an ex parte basis, such request for the entry of a prejudgment remedy ex parte is denied. A telephonic status conference to address the Motion for Prejudgment Remedy will be held on June 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that the defendants have been served with the Complaint and all relevant filings, including the calendar notice for the telephonic status conference. The calendar notice will include the conference dial in for the call. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 6/4/2020.(Watson, M.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Universitas Education, LLC re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy (Letter to Judge Spector Requesting Oral Argument) (Caldwell, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Manson, III on behalf of Universitas Education, LLC (Manson, Joseph)
June 3, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph L. Manson III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5886229) by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph L. Manson III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5886229) by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for ruling on #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #15 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/2/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/1/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Universitas Education, LLC. (Caldwell, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 EXHIBIT 41-47 to PJR Application by Universitas Education, LLC re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy . (Caldwell, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT 31-40 to PJR Application by Universitas Education, LLC re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy . (Caldwell, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 21-30 to PJR Application by Universitas Education, LLC. re #9 OTION for Prejudgment Remedy (Caldwell, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2020 (Blough, B.).
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBIT 11-20 to PJR Application by Universitas Education, LLC.re #9 OTION for Prejudgment Remedy . (Caldwell, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2020 (Blough, B.).
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBIT 1-10 to PJR Application by Universitas Education, LLC re #9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy . (Caldwell, Michael)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Exhibits 1-47 filed separately due to size), #2 Affidavit of Sharon Siebert (Exh. A), #3 Affidavit of Benjamin Chernow (Exh. B), #4 Text of Proposed Order (Exh. C), #5 Exhibit Claim Form-- GMP, #6 Exhibit Claim Form-- Molly Carpenter)(Caldwell, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph L. Manson III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5886229) by Universitas Education, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph L. Manson III)(Caldwell, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilan Markus on behalf of Universitas Education, LLC (Markus, Ilan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alliance Charitable Trust, Atlantic Charitable Trust, Avon Charitable Trust, Benistar, Benistar Admin Services, Inc., Molly Carpenter, Carpenter Charitable Trust, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, Grist Mill Partners, LLC, Moonstone Partners, LLC, Phoenix Charitable Trust, TPG Group Inc, Donald Trudeau* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael G. Caldwell* *Barclay Damon, LLP* *545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Freberg, B)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Universitas Education, LLC, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/29/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2020' Discovery due by 11/27/2020' Dispositive Motions due by 1/1/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
May 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Caldwell, Michael)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5883546.), filed by Universitas Education, LLC.(Caldwell, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universitas Education, LLC v. Benistar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benistar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trudeau
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Represented By: Michael R. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grist Mill Partners, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S. Grossman
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Charitable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Entities Under Control of Judgment Debtors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter Charitable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benistar Administrative Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moonstone Partners, LLC
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Represented By: Michael R. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Charitable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Entities Under Control of Molly Carpenter and/or Donald Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Charitable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Charitable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Carpenter
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Represented By: Michael R. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benistar Admin Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Represented By: Michael R. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Group Inc
Represented By: Dan E. LaBelle
Represented By: Michael R. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universitas Education, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Caldwell
Represented By: Ilan Markus
Represented By: Joseph L Manson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?