American General Life Insurance Company v. Grohs et al
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Vickie Frenzel and Kelly W Grohs
Case Number: 3:2020cv00798
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Special Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against Kelly W Grohs by Vickie Frenzel.(Moraghan, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Defendant Kelly W. Grohs by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Mary Mintel Miller)(Miller, Mary)
July 9, 2020 Filing 11 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $121,296.08. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Vickie Frenzel waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020 filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Miller, Mary)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (see attached). Plaintiff's #5 Motion for the Investment of Registry Funds for the Court Registry Investment System Disputed Ownership Fund is GRANTED. The Clerk shall accept a check from Plaintiff made payable to "Clerk, U.S. District Court" in the sum stated in the attached Order. Upon receipt of the check, the Clerk shall deposit the interpleader funds into the U.S. Treasury to be invested in the Court Registry Investment System (CRIS) Disputed Ownership Fund (DOF). The interpleader funds shall be placed in an interest-bearing account in the name of "Clerk of Court of the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut, Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-00798." The Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts shall administer the funds, charge fees, and withhold and pay taxes, under its Disputed Ownership Funds system (CRIS DOF), in accordance with this Court's Order Regarding Deposit and Investment of Registry Funds entered December 1, 2016. The funds deposited with the CRIS shall remain on deposit until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on June 26, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Moraghan on behalf of Vickie Frenzel (Moraghan, David)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Return of Service Acknowledgment filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Miller, Mary)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kelly W Grohs* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary Mintel Miller* *Reid & Reige, P.C.* *One Financial Plaza 21st Flr* *Hartford, CT 27846*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 11, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Kelly W Grohs. (Miller, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by American General Life Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 06/09/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2020 Discovery due by 12/9/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2021 Signed by Clerk on 06/09/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 9, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Interpleader Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5906718.), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American General Life Insurance Company v. Grohs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Mintel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Frenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly W Grohs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?