Vitorino v. Target Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosabela Vitorino
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00803
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Standing Order on Joint Trial Memorandum attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #13 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the procedure set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings by August 9, 2020. The Defendant shall respond to any amended complaint by August 29, 2020. Motions to join additional parties shall be filed as permitted by the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All discovery shall be completed by December 10, 2020. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by January 14, 2021. The Court will set a date for filing a joint trial memorandum after the close of discovery. The joint trial memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for December 17, 2020 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)Set Deadlines/Hearings:Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings by August 9, 2020Defendant shall respond to any amended complaint by August 29, 2020Discovery shall be completed by December 10, 2020Dispositive Motions due by January 14, 2021Telephonic Status Conference set for December 17, 2020 at 10:00 AM
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. The parties request that the settlement conference be scheduled for on or about December 16, 2020 can be taken up with Magistrate Judge Richardson. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2020.(Gould, K.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Cahill on behalf of Rosabela Vitorino (Cahill, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. (Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. Civil Miscellaneous Notices and Orders (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Stores, Inc.. (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Target Stores, Inc. Notice by Target Stores, Inc. of No Pending Motions in State Court (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Target Stores, Inc., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Stores, Inc., #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Stores, Inc. (Neborsky, Dawn)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2020. Discovery due by 12/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Stores, Inc. from JD of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV20-6104004-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5907912, filed by Target Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Neborsky, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitorino v. Target Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosabela Vitorino
Represented By: Michael W. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?