Lopez v. Black et al
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Defendant: Denise Walker, Jeanette Maldonado and Allison Black
Case Number: 3:2020cv00817
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/10/20. (Payton, R.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 7/9/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/18/20.(Payton, R.)
June 12, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re: #3 Standing Protective Order. Replacement PDF uploaded to correct judge. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia) Modified on 6/12/2020 to correct judge (Reis, Julia). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2020: #1 Replacement PDF) (Reis, Julia).
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Lopez. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Allison Black, Jeanette Maldonado, Denise Walker, filed by David Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Black et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?