Brewster v. Harnois
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Brewster
Defendant: CherylAnn Harnois
Case Number: 3:2020cv00828
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Approved. So ORDERED re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CherylAnn Harnois. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by CherylAnn Harnois (Larson, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Service filed by CherylAnn Harnois, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by CherylAnn Harnois, #2 Notice (Other) filed by CherylAnn Harnois. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/16/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/16/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2020, Discovery due by 12/16/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
June 16, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CherylAnn Harnois (Larson, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by CherylAnn Harnois of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet)(Larson, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CherylAnn Harnois from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NNH-CV20-6104497-S., filed by CherylAnn Harnois. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Certification of Scope of Employment)(Larson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewster v. Harnois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CherylAnn Harnois
Represented By: John W. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Brewster
Represented By: Matthew Julian Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?