Seniw v. Bagwell et al
Plaintiff: Bohdan George Seniw
Defendant: Edward C. Rice, United Services Automobile Association, Katia Lee Bagwell and Dawn G. Rice
Case Number: 3:2020cv00881
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Katia Lee Bagwell, Dawn G. Rice, Edward C. Rice, United Services Automobile Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Bohdan George Seniw* *c/o 19 Oak Lane* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBITS by Bohdan George Seniw to Request to Issue Summons. (Fanelle, N.)
August 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Katia Lee Bagwell, Dawn G. Rice, Edward C. Rice, United Services Automobile Association. (Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Set Deadliness: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/31/2020 (Perez, J.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Wade Cannavino, Jr on behalf of Katia Lee Bagwell, Dawn G. Rice, Edward C. Rice, United Services Automobile Association (Cannavino, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Bohdan George Seniw, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2020. Discovery due by 12/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Filing fee received from Bohdan G. Seniw: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00011389. (Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katia Lee Bagwell, Dawn G. Rice, Edward C. Rice, United Services Automobile Association, filed by Bohdan George Seniw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seniw v. Bagwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward C. Rice
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katia Lee Bagwell
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn G. Rice
Represented By: John Wade Cannavino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bohdan George Seniw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?