Howlett et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Howlett and Ryan Howlett
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc., KAB Seating, Ltd. and Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00887
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM of Rule 16 Pretrial Conference and ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/20/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephonic Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 8/20/2020. Total Time: 0 hours and 16 minutes. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/10/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Rule 16 Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650.8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Rosenberg, J.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Amata, Doreen)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2020 To Plead by Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc., KAB Seating, Ltd.. (Tetreault, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc. to 7/31/2020. (Jaiman, R.)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/24/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2020 To Plead by Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc., KAB Seating, Ltd.. (Tetreault, Brian)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Tetreault on behalf of Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc., KAB Seating, Ltd. (Tetreault, Brian)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar, Inc..(Lantry, Jacob)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kimberly Howlett, Ryan Howlett. (Walsh, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Walsh on behalf of Kimberly Howlett, Ryan Howlett (Walsh, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Doreen West Amata on behalf of Kimberly Howlett, Ryan Howlett (Amata, Doreen)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Caterpillar, Inc., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) filed by Caterpillar, Inc., #9 Standing Protective Order, #4 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Caterpillar, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Caterpillar, Inc., #8 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher B. Parkerson on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacob Lantry on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 06/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2020. Discovery due by 12/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/26/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 26, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Lantry, Jacob)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Parkerson on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Parkerson, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Caterpillar, Inc. of No Pending Motions (Lantry, Jacob)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Lantry, Jacob)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Lantry on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Lantry, Jacob)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caterpillar, Inc. from J.D. of Hartford Superior Court, case number HD-CV20-6128362-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5940536, filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: State of Removal, #4 Exhibit D: C.A. Cover Sheet)(Lantry, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howlett et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Howlett
Represented By: Michael Joseph Walsh
Represented By: Doreen West Amata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Howlett
Represented By: Michael Joseph Walsh
Represented By: Doreen West Amata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Parkerson
Represented By: Jacob Lantry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAB Seating, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Tetreault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Vehicle Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Tetreault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?