Nordstrom v. McMahon et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Nordstrom
Defendant: Paul Levesque, Alan M. Wexler, Stuart U. Goldfarb, George A. Barrios, Robyn W. Peterson, Vincent K. McMahon, Michelle D Wilson, Stephanie McMahon, Frank A. Riddick, III, Laureen Ong, Jeffrey R. Speed, Man Jit Singh and Patricia A Gottesman
Nominal Defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Interested Party: Melvyn Klein and Ryan Merholz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00904
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.Responses due by 9/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Tarlowe on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Tarlowe, Richard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Anderson on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Anderson, Justin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Kramer, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore V. Wells, Jr on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Wells, Theodore)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore V. Wells, Jr. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Kramer. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin Anderson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard C. Tarlowe. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore V. Wells, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6056931) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6055837) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin Anderson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6055819) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard C. Tarlowe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6055781) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin A. Kuehn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6030461) by Rodney Nordstrom. (Moore, Fletcher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, filed by Rodney Nordstrom.(Moore, Fletcher)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Justin A. Kuehn. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Justin A. Kuehn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6030461) by Rodney Nordstrom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec. of Justin Kuehn)(Moore, Fletcher)
August 1, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE: call-in information for Telephonic Motions Hearing set for October 15, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.: Once all counsel are on the line, please call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Leon, Noel)
August 1, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Motions Hearing as to #39 MOTION to Remand to State Court , and any other motions yet to be filed consistent with the Court's order #40 , set for October 15, 2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Leon, Noel)
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases without prejudice to renewal following the resolution of any motions to dismiss and motions to remand this case back to Connecticut Superior Court. Consistent with the Court's recent order granting an extension of time to file a motion to dismiss, the Court sets the following briefing schedule: Any motions to dismiss shall be filed by August 28, 2020 ; any responses to any motions to remand or dismiss shall be filed by September 18, 2020 ; and any replies to any such responses shall be filed by October 2, 2020. Oral argument on any motions already filed or yet to be filed consistent with this Order will be argued on October 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/1/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rodney Nordstrom.Responses due by 8/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Moore, Fletcher)
July 31, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants August 28, 2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 for Defendants to answer or file motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/31/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2020 to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 29, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. Topetzes on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Topetzes, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Kornobis on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Kornobis, Theodore)
July 24, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore L. Kornobis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5991272) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen G. Topetzes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5991302) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Attorney Stephen G. Topetzes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2020. (Oliver, T.)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Attorney Theodore L. Kornobis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2020. (Oliver, T.)
July 23, 2020 Answer deadline updated to August 7, 2020, for All Defendants. (Leon, Noel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/23/2020. Total Time: 22 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) The Court sua sponte extended the deadline until August 7, 2020, for Defendants to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Leon, Noel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen G. Topetzes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5991302) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Stephen G. Topetzes)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Theodore L. Kornobis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5991272) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Theodore L. Kornobis)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:20-CV-00743; 3:20-CV-00557 filed by Rodney Nordstrom. (Moore, Fletcher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #21 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Melvyn Klein, Ryan Merholz. (Egleston, Gregory)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:20-CV-00743; 3:20-CV-00557 filed by Ryan Merholz, Melvyn Klein. (Egleston, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to July 27, 2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time until July 27, 2020, for Defendants to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/16/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for July 23, 2020, at 2:00 PM, before Judge Victor A. Bolden, in this action, along with Kooi v. McMahon, et al., No. 3:20-CV-00743-VAB; and Merholz et al. v. McMahon, et al., No. 3:20-cv-00557-VAB.Dial: 888-808-6929Participant Code: 9284309If you are prompted to enter a security code, please bypass it.(Leon, Noel)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Status Conference. A telephonic status conference will be scheduled in this action, along with Kooi v. McMahon, et al., No. 3:20-CV-00743-VAB; and Merholz et al. v. McMahon, et al., No. 3:20-cv-00557-VAB. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/15/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Status Conference by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 07/07/20. (Barry, Donna)
July 2, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until July 27, 2020 to file an answer or motion addressed to the Complaint in this case by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:20-CV-00743; 3:20-CV-00557 by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc.Responses due by 7/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Curtis B. Krasik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5949144) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5947847) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis B. Krasik on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Krasik, Curtis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry S. McDevitt on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (McDevitt, Jerry)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Curtis B. Krasik. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/02/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jerry S. McDevitt. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/02/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Vincent K. McMahon, Stephanie McMahon, Patricia A Gottesman, Laureen Ong, Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Michelle D Wilson, Stuart U. Goldfarb, #5 Notice of Related Case filed by Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Patricia A Gottesman, Laureen Ong, Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, #2 Notice of Appearance, filed by Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Patricia A Gottesman, Laureen Ong, Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice (Other), filed by Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Patricia A Gottesman, Laureen Ong, Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, #6 Notice (Other), filed by Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Patricia A Gottesman, Laureen Ong, Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 07/01/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 07/01/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2020 Discovery due by 12/31/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2021 Signed by Clerk on 07/01/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 7/1/2020 to correct text (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Curtis B. Krasik to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5949144) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc Statement Pursuant to Standing Order On Removed Cases (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by All Defendants (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jerry S. McDevitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5947847) by George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Mueller on behalf of George A. Barrios, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Patricia A Gottesman, Paul Levesque, Stephanie McMahon, Vincent K. McMahon, Laureen Ong, Robyn W. Peterson, Frank A. Riddick, III, Man Jit Singh, Jeffrey R. Speed, Alan M. Wexler, Michelle D Wilson, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc (Mueller, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Frank A. Riddick, III, Laureen Ong, Jeffrey R. Speed, Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Patricia A Gottesman, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, Alan M. Wexler, Robyn W. Peterson, Stephanie McMahon from Connecticut Superior Court, case number FST-CV-20-6046965. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5947775, filed by Paul Levesque, Man Jit Singh, George A. Barrios, Frank A. Riddick, III, Laureen Ong, Jeffrey R. Speed, Vincent K. McMahon, World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc, Patricia A Gottesman, Stuart U. Goldfarb, Michelle D Wilson, Alan M. Wexler, Robyn W. Peterson, Stephanie McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mueller, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordstrom v. McMahon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Levesque
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M. Wexler
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart U. Goldfarb
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Barrios
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robyn W. Peterson
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent K. McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle D Wilson
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie McMahon
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank A. Riddick, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureen Ong
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Speed
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Jit Singh
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A Gottesman
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Nordstrom
Represented By: Fletcher William Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: World Wrestling Entertainment, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Mueller
Represented By: Richard Tarlowe
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Jerry S. McDevitt
Represented By: Curtis B. Krasik
Represented By: Stephen G. Topetzes
Represented By: Theodore Kornobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Melvyn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ryan Merholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?