Lipusz v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: John Joseph Lipusz, Jr
Defendant: Colleen Gallahger and Johnny C. Wright
Case Number: 3:2020cv00912
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER. Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Inmate Account Ledger Sheet is GRANTED, for good cause shown. Plaintiff must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months of transactions on or before September 25, 2020. If the insufficiency is not corrected, this case will be dismissed, as explained in the Court's prior Order. See Doc. 5. Additionally, Plaintiff represents that he was recently released from Department of Correction custody. Doc. 21, at 1. Accordingly, on or before September 25, 2020, Plaintiff is directed to submit to the Court a Notice of Change of Address as well. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(c)(2) ("Any self-represented party must provide an address where service can be made upon such party."). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on August 25, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Inmate Account Supplemental 5 Order re: Insufficiency, by John Joseph Lipusz, Jr. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Joseph Lipusz, Jr (Payton, R.)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months Transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 7/30/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/9/20.(Payton, R.)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 07/02/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/02/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Joseph Lipusz, Jr. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified text on 7/7/2020 to add PRISCS (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Colleen Gallahger, Johnny C. Wright, filed by John Joseph Lipusz, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Envelope)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipusz v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Gallahger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Lipusz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?