In Re: Martin
Appellant: Pat Labbadia, III
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
Appellee: Bradford Martin and Thomas Holthausen
In Re: Bradford J Martin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00939
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 Martin's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/04/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re: Appellant's Objection (ECF 9) filed by Bradford Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 List of Holidays and Court Closures 2020, #2 Exhibit 2 Exhibit A to the Local Rules)(Sternberg, Jenna)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Extend Time filed by Pat Labbadia, III. (Labbadia, Pat)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for an extension of time. Labbadia's obligations under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009 are extended to 14 days after the resolution of the pending motion to dismiss. Labbadia's opposition to Martin's motion to dismiss, doc. no. #6 , is due by Friday, August 7. Martin's reply is due by Friday, August 21. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/22/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time regarding deadline set in 5 NOTICE of Bankruptcy appeal by Pat Labbadia, III. (Blough, B.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bradford Martin.Responses due by 8/7/2020 (Sternberg, Jenna)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: A notice of appeal was transmitted by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 7/8/2020 and entered on the docket on 7/8/2020. The appellant and appellee shall comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Within 14 days, the appellant shall file a notice with this Court either that appellant has filed with the Bankruptcy Court a designation and statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B), or that the parties have prepared an agreed statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d), and attach to the notice a copy of such filing. Failure to comply with this notice may result in the case being dismissed. Designation Notice due by: 7/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/8/2020.(Fanelle, N.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/8/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/8/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-3001, 18-31636, filed by Pat Labbadia, III. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Judgment, #2 Bankruptcy Memorandum, #3 Bankruptcy Ruling and Memorandum, #4 Bankruptcy Order on Motion, #5 Bankruptcy Order on Motion)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pat Labbadia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bradford Martin
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Holthausen
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bradford J Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?