Petitt v. Badura et al
Plaintiff: Daryl Petitt
Defendant: Rollin Cook, Steven Badura, Connecticut Department of Corrections and Truoiolo
Case Number: 3:2020cv00973
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL(Doc. #8). The Court DENIES the motion to appoint counsel without prejudice to renewal for lack of an adequate showing at this time that plaintiff's claims have a sufficient likelihood of merit to warrant the appointment of counsel. See Hendricks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390, 393 (2d Cir. 1997); Hodge v. Police Officers, 802 F.2d 58, 61-62 (2d Cir. 1983). The Court will reconsider whether it is appropriate to appoint counsel when it issues an initial review order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/6/2020. (Freberg, B)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daryl Petitt. (Attachments: #1 Accompanying Letter, #2 Envelope)(Freberg, B)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at anytime during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/24/20. (Payton, R.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daryl Petitt. (Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daryl Petitt. (Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Steven Badura, Rollin Cook, Connecticut Department of Corrections, Truoiolo, filed by Daryl Petitt.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petitt v. Badura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Badura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truoiolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Petitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?