Williams v. Roman
Plaintiff: Alexandria Williams
Defendant: Louis Roman
Case Number: 3:2020cv00982
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Louis Roman Amended Complaint against Louis Roman, filed by Louis Roman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Notice and complaint)(Roman, Louis)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/12/2020.(Lewis, D)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION by self-represented litigant to participate in electronic filing. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/12/2020. (Lewis, D)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO #7 Order to Show Cause, by Louis Roman filed by Louis Roman. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by self-represented litigant to participate in electronic filing by Louis Roman.Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Roman must show cause why the case should not be remanded to state court for improper removal, or dismissed, within 21 days. Failure to show cause within that time will result in the remand or dismissal of this case. Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/21/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2020 Filing fee received from Louis Roman: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00011367. (Fanelle, N.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Louis Roman Signed by Clerk on 07/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/16/2020 to edit text(Fazekas, J.).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2020. Discovery due by 1/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louis Roman from Superior Court, Bridgeport, case number FBT-BA19-4055815-S., filed by Louis Roman.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?