Dickerson v. Fairton FCI
Plaintiff: James Dickerson
Defendant: Fairton FCI
Case Number: 3:2020cv00994
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Set deadline: filing fee or in forma pauperis application due by 9/23/2020 per Dkt. 5. (Shafer, J.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff was ordered on July 20, 2020 to pay the filing fee of $400.00 or complete an in forma pauperis application which was mailed on that same day by August 10, 2020. Plaintiff failed to do so. The Plaintiff is ordered to comply with the Courts July 20, 2020 order by September 23, 2020 or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/08/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency: You must submit the filing fee of $400.00 or the attached IFP Prisoner's application which is being sent to you via U.S.mail If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 8/10/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/20/20.(Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against Fairton FCI, filed by James Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Fairton FCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairton FCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?