In re: Onlineautoparts.com, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony S. Novak
Defendant: Parts Authority, LLC
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
In Re: Onlineautoparts.com, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00995
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion to Transfer. This matter is a bankruptcy adversary proceeding. Pursuant to this Courts Standing Order re: Bankruptcy Cases and Proceedings, the Clerk is directed to close this case and transfer it to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/7/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Anthony S. Novak. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02948.
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court; Plaintiff's motion to refer this matter to the Bankruptcy Court (D.E. 4) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the District of Connecticut with the recommendation that the Connecticut District Court refer the matter to Judge James J. Tancredi of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut. All future filings shall be made to the docket in the District of Connecticut. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/16/2020. C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Refer/Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Anthony S. Novak. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
July 7, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Anthony S. Novak (Hellman, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parts Authority, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13010256 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Anthony S. Novak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hellman, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Landow, Concetta).
July 2, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet, Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Onlineautoparts.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony S. Novak
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parts Authority, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Onlineautoparts.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?