Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC v. Massgen I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC
Defendant: Mario Massimino, Massgen I, LLC and Michael Massimino
Case Number: 3:2020cv00996
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 10/5/2020 to hold the Parties' Planning Meeting. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/11/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 5, 2020 to Hold the Parties' Planning Meeting by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC. (Cesaroni, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino.(Nugent, James)
August 19, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Mario Massimino to 9/1/2020; Michael Massimino to 9/1/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 9/1/2020 to file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/19/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 1, 2020 responsive pleading by Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino. (Nugent, James)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Approved. So ORDERED re #11 Stipulation filed by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/19/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Service of Process by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC. (Cesaroni, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Moyher on behalf of Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino (Moyher, Thomas)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Nugent on behalf of Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino (Nugent, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Massgen I, LLC, Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Louis Cesaroni* *Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C* *10 Middle Street 15th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Massgen I, LLC, Mario Massimino, Michael Massimino. (Cesaroni, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC, #1 Complaint, filed by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020, Discovery due by 1/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC. (Cesaroni, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Cesaroni on behalf of Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC (Cesaroni, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5979574.), filed by Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Romney, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC v. Massgen I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mapleton Real Estate Advisors, LLC
Represented By: John Louis Cesaroni
Represented By: Aaron Romney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Massimino
Represented By: Thomas W Moyher
Represented By: James M. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massgen I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Massimino
Represented By: Thomas W Moyher
Represented By: James M. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?