Diaz v. Bowles et al
Plaintiff: Noel Diaz
Defendant: John Doe, Bowles and Baymon
Case Number: 3:2020cv00997
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Noel Diaz (Payton, R.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Noel Diaz.Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Payton, R.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Make Legal Calls During Business Hours and Protect Against Retalitation by Noel Diaz. (Fazekas, J.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 8/20/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/30/20.(Payton, R.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to make legal calls and Protect against retaliation by Noel Diaz. (Payton, R.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to 6 Order re: Insufficiency, filed by Noel Diaz. (Payton, R.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2020: #1 Exhibit -Complaint) (Payton, R.).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 8/17/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/27/20.(Payton, R.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Letter/Notice from Noel Diaz Dated 7/23/20 Re: Prison conditions (Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/17/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/17/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/17/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Noel Diaz. (Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Baymon, Bowles, John Doe(Deputy Commissioner), John Doe(Regional Warden), John Doe( Commissioner), filed by Noel Diaz.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Bowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baymon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?