Hall et al v. Anheuser-Busch LLC
Plaintiff: Dichello Distributors, Inc and John Hall
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC and Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01003
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Dominic J Squatrito
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Restated Wholesaler Equity Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Decision of Appeals Referee)(Baldwin, Mark)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Anheuser-Busch, LLC.Responses due by 10/2/2020 (Baldwin, Mark)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is scheduled for 9/15/20 at 2:30 PM with Judge Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Parrilla, Geraldo)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/3/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020.(Hushin, Z.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Horvack, John)
August 24, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Anheuser-Busch, LLC to 9/11/2020 per Dkt. 21 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for good cause. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed by 09/11/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/24/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #17 Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Baldwin, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dichello Distributors, Inc. (Horvack, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims and Demand for Trial by Jury by Dichello Distributors, Inc.(Horvack, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Trial By Jury against Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, filed by Dichello Distributors, Inc.(Horvack, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian K. Gunningsmith on behalf of Dichello Distributors, Inc (Gunningsmith, Damian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Hardy on behalf of Dichello Distributors, Inc (Hardy, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Horvack, Jr on behalf of Dichello Distributors, Inc (Horvack, John)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. The parties are reminded that the pendency of a motion to dismiss does not automatically stay discovery, except in cases covered by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. See Brooks v. Macy's, Inc., No. 10-CIV-5304, 2010 WL 5297756, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 21, 2010) (collecting cases), reh'g denied, No. 10-CIV-5304, 2011 WL 1362191 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 8, 2011); see also Moran v. Flaherty, No. 92-CV-3200, 1992 WL 276913, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 25, 1992). The court may enter a stay of discovery in its discretion upon a showing [as distinguished from an assertion] of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c); see also Integrated Sys. & Power, Inc. v. Honeywell Int'l, Inc. , No. 09-CIV-5874, 2009 WL 2777076, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 1, 2009); accord Ellington Credit Fund, Ltd. v. Select Portfolio Servs., Inc. , No. 08-CV-2437, 2009 WL 274483, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 3, 2009). In determining whether good cause exists, the court considers several factors including: (1) whether a defendant has made a strong showing that the plaintiff's claim is unmeritorious, (2) the breadth of discovery and the burden of responding to it, and (3) the risk of unfair prejudice to the party opposing the stay. Negrete v. Citibank, N.A., No. 15-CV-7250, 2015 WL 8207466, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 7, 2015). Other factors include the nature of the case, whether dismissal will resolve the case, effect of dismissal on the scope of discovery, age of the case, complexity of discovery needed, remedy sought, extensions previously granted, parties' diligence, judicial efficiency, and other appropriate factors. Discovery in this case is NOT stayed. Accordingly, any party moving to stay discovery must demonstrate, as oppose to assert, the Court should exercise its discretion to stay the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/24/2020. (Shafer, J.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC Statement on Removed Case (Baldwin, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Dichello Distributors, Inc by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC.(Baldwin, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS I, II, III, IV, AND V OF THE COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS JOHN HALL AS A PLAINTIFF filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Decision of Appeals Referee, #3 Exhibit 2 - letter dated August 28, 2015)(Baldwin, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS I, II, III, IV, AND V OF THE COMPLAINT AND TO DISMISS JOHN HALL AS A PLAINTIFF by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC.Responses due by 8/14/2020 (Baldwin, Mark)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #6 Standing Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, #5 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020; Discovery due by 1/16/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Velez, F.)
July 17, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Baldwin on behalf of Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC (Baldwin, Mark) Modified on 7/17/2020 to update party (Anastasio, F.).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc, Other Affiliate Anheuser-Busch InBev NV/SA for Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. (Baldwin, Mark) Modified to update party on 7/17/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC, from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NNH-CV20-6105163-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5979980, filed by Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - process, pleadings, and orders served upon Anheuser-Busch, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, Connecticut Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldwin, Mark) Modified to update party on 7/17/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Anheuser-Busch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Companies LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dichello Distributors, Inc
Represented By: Leonard C. Reizfeld
Represented By: Damian K. Gunningsmith
Represented By: David S. Hardy
Represented By: John R. Horvack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hall
Represented By: Leonard C. Reizfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?