Cotterell v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debbi Cotterell
Defendant: H&L Chevrolet, General Motors LLC, ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing, Richard Chevrolet, Inc. and ACAR Leasing Ltd. doing business as GM Financial Leasing
Counter Claimant: ACAR Leasing Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01009
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Debbi Cotterell. (Cotterell, Debbi)
August 26, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by General Motors LLC.Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Duggan, Timothy)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint (ECF No. 31). As a result, Defendants' #18 motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED as moot. If Defendants renew their motion to dismiss, they may incorporate by reference any prior briefing.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/13/2020. (Super, John)
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debbi Cotterell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H)(Cotterell, Debbi)
August 5, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Debbi Cotterell.(Cotterell, Debbi)
August 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Humphrey on behalf of H&L Chevrolet (Humphrey, Tyler)
August 3, 2020 Filing 28 ENTERED IN ERROR: NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe Angotta on behalf of H&L Chevrolet AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS (Angotta, Chloe) Modified on 8/4/2020 docketed on wrong case (Reis, Julia).
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. F. Niederer on behalf of H&L Chevrolet AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PAPERS (Niederer, Eric)
July 31, 2020 Set Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 8/13/2020 (Johnson, D.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The Defendant has filed an #18 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff has filed a response (ECF No. 23). Should the plaintiff wish to file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendants' memorandum of law, plaintiff shall so file by August 13, 2020. The Court will not allow further amendments after August 13, 2020. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendants renew their motion to dismiss, Defendants may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/31/2020. (Super, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by General Motors LLC to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (Duggan, Timothy)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Defendants' #22 notice is insufficient under D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12(a). The represented movant must also file copies of D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 12(a). Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file such copies in compliance with Local Rule 12(a) within 7 days, or the Court will deny Defendants' #18 motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/29/2020. (Super, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Debbi Cotterell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Cotterell, Debbi)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by General Motors LLC to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (Duggan, Timothy)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/24/20.(Johnson, D.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Debbi Cotterell by ACAR Leasing Ltd..(Grant, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Plaintiff's #17 motion is hereby GRANTED.The Court notes that Defendants have not filed the required notice to a pro se litigant under Local Rule 12(a) that must accompany a motion to dismiss by a represented party. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file such a notice within 7 days, or the Court will deny Defendants' #18 motion to dismiss without prejudice.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/24/2020. (Super, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by General Motors LLC.Responses due by 8/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Duggan, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT TO PARTICIPATE IN ELECTRONIC FILING by Debbi Cotterell. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 Appearance Self Represented Party by Debbi Cotterell. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Opposition to #1 Notice of Removal by Debbi Cotterell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Agati, Kathryn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by ACAR Leasing Ltd., General Motors LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL) (Grant, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward N. Storck, III on behalf of Richard Chevrolet, Inc. (Storck, Edward)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Duggan on behalf of General Motors LLC (Duggan, Timothy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #6 Affidavit filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #4 Notice (Other) filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd., #10 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020, Discovery due by 1/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M Lacombe on behalf of ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing (Lacombe, Elizabeth)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service Signed By Elizabeth M Lacombe filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing. (Grant, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a GM Financial, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, L.L.C. for ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing. (Grant, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing of Pending Motions (Grant, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Grant on behalf of ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing (Grant, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing re #1 Notice of Removal, re Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order re Disclosure Statement, #2 Supplement Notice to Counsel)(Grant, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST-CV-20-6047107-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5980426, filed by ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grant, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotterell v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&L Chevrolet
Represented By: Tyler Humphrey
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Timothy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Represented By: Michael Thomas Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Edward N. Storck, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACAR Leasing Ltd. doing business as GM Financial Leasing
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Represented By: Michael Thomas Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbi Cotterell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ACAR Leasing Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth M Lacombe
Represented By: Michael Thomas Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?