Centeno v. Seramonte Estates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Centeno
Defendant: Seramonte Estates, LLC and Detail Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01010
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC. (Lisi, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following call in information for the call. Call in 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 8/17/2021; Initial Status Report due by 9/13/2020; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 7/2/2021; Settlement Conference 9/2021; Trial Ready Date 12/1/2021 ; Trial Brief due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/13/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lisi, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC No Pending Motions (Lisi, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan K. Nelligan on behalf of Orlando Centeno (Nelligan, Brendan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Special Defenses by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC.(Lisi, Christopher)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Seramonte Estates, LLC, Detail Management, LLC, #4 Jury Demand filed by Seramonte Estates, LLC, Detail Management, LLC, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Seramonte Estates, LLC, Detail Management, LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Seramonte Estates, LLC, Detail Management, LLC, #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Attorney Christopher J. Lisi. filed by Seramonte Estates, LLC, Detail Management, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Standing Protective Order, #7 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020, Discovery due by 1/16/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 17, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC. (Lisi, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC. (Lisi, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC Notice of Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases (Lisi, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Attorney Christopher J. Lisi by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC. (Lisi, Christopher) Modified on 7/20/2020 to correct text from motion (Walker, J.).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NNH-CV20-6105911-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5980567, filed by Detail Management, LLC, Seramonte Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Return of Service, #4 Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lisi, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centeno v. Seramonte Estates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Centeno
Represented By: Brendan K. Nelligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seramonte Estates, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Lisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detail Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Lisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?