McGurrin v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Nancy McGurrin
Defendant: Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01023
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A video settlement conference set for 2/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert A. Richardson. Video conference instructions have been provided to counsel via email. (Downey, Erin)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: A video settlement conference is scheduled for 2/4/2021 at 10:30 AM with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 9/18/2020. (Downey, Erin)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for a Settlement Conference in February 2021. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #14 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by January 21, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by February 22, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 22, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by February 22, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on October 30, 2020 at 4:30 PM. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/17/2020. (Martinez, C.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Claim by Target Corporation.(Neborsky, Dawn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Nancy McGurrin. (Rossetti, Joseph)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Rocco Rossetti on behalf of Nancy McGurrin (Rossetti, Joseph)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Target Corporation.(Neborsky, Dawn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Corporation, #10 Protective Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Target Corporation, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Target Corporation Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
July 21, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/19/2020; Discovery due by 1/20/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 2/24/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 21, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. (Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. (Civil Miscellaneous Notices and Orders) (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc.. (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. (Notice of No Pending Motions in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. (Neborsky, Dawn)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc. from JD of Hartford at Hartford, case number NNH-CV-20-6106125-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5986738, filed by Target Corporation D/B/A Target Stores, Inc..(Neborsky, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGurrin v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy McGurrin
Represented By: Daniel W. Adelman
Represented By: Joseph Rocco Rossetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?