Hampton v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Esther Hampton
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and Kasey Williams
Case Number: 3:2020cv01029
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 WRIT of Supplemental Return Returned Unexecuted as to Kasey Williams. (Dufour, Chrysten)
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Discovery due by 9/1/2021 ; Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021; Joint Trial Memorandu due by 10/1/2021(Gutierrez, Y.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #14 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All fact discovery shall be completed by May 1, 2021, and all other interim fact discovery dates set forth in the parties Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Parties shall designate their expert witnesses by June 1, 2021, and expert witness discovery shall be completed by September 1, 2021. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 1, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 31, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by October 1, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on February 5, 2021 at 3:00 PM. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/27/20. (DeBot, B.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vossler, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Chrysten Anne Dufour on behalf of Esther Hampton (Dufour, Chrysten)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #2 Notice (Other), filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #4 Jury Demand filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Kasey Williams, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/23/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020 Discovery due by 1/22/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 22, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/7/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/22/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 22, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams. (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice to Counsel re Local Rule 5(b)) (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance With Standing Order In Removed Cases) (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams. (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams (Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Superior Court Notice of Filing of Removal)(Vossler, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD CV 20 6130137S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5987856, filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Kasey Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint)(Vossler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Hampton
Represented By: Gregory E. O'Brien
Represented By: Chrysten Anne Dufour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasey Williams
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?