Cornelius v. Luna et al
Plaintiff: Kijana Cornelius
Defendant: Nikki Curry, Ray Bright, Jose Luna, Clayton Howze and Ronald Pressley
Case Number: 3:2020cv01047
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Ray Bright to 10/5/2020; Nikki Curry to 10/5/2020; Clayton Howze to 10/5/2020; Jose Luna to 10/5/2020; Ronald Pressley to 10/5/2020. See 10 Order. (Bozek, M.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/03/20. (Covello, Alfred)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 5, 2020 to File Responsive Pleading by Ray Bright, Nikki Curry, Clayton Howze, Jose Luna, Ronald Pressley. (Wolak, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Wolak, III on behalf of Ray Bright, Nikki Curry, Clayton Howze, Jose Luna, Ronald Pressley (Wolak, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 Docket Entry Correction re #6 Summons Returned Executed. Modified docket text to correct which parties were served. (Bozek, M.)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kijana Cornelius. Jose Luna, Ronald Pressley, Clayton Howze, Ray Bright, Nikki Curry served on 8/6/2020, answer due 9/5/2020. (Jacobs, Steven) Modified on 8/13/2020 to correct which parties were served (Bozek, M.).
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ray Bright, Nikki Curry, Clayton Howze, Jose Luna, Ronald Pressley* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Steven D. Jacobs* *Jacobs & Jacobs, LLC* *700 State Street, 3rd Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Bozek, M.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kijana Cornelius, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2020.(Bozek, M.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/23/2020.(Bozek, M.)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020. Discovery due by 1/22/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2020.(Bozek, M.)
July 23, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 23, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Jacobs, Steven)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5993038.), filed by Kijana Cornelius.(Jacobs, Steven) Modified on 7/24/2020 to update party name (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelius v. Luna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Curry
Represented By: Michael A. Wolak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Bright
Represented By: Michael A. Wolak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Luna
Represented By: Michael A. Wolak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Howze
Represented By: Michael A. Wolak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Pressley
Represented By: Michael A. Wolak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kijana Cornelius
Represented By: Steven D. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?