Doe v. Bemer
Plaintiff: James Doe
Defendant: Bruce J Bemer
Case Number: 3:2020cv01103
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Hartford. (Shafer, J.)
September 3, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 JUDGMENT as to Count Four.For appeal forms please go to the following website: www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (Shafer, J.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion to remand to state court. Dkt. #14 The Court dismisses with prejudice Count Four of the Amended Complaint alleging Violations of the Trafficking Victims Protection Act, 18 U.S.C. 1595(a)("TVPA"), as Plaintiff concedes that his TVPA claims are time barred and 1595(a) does not apply retroactively. Dkt. #14 at 9. Leave to amend would be futile. Original jurisdiction exists over Plaintiff's TVPA claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 because Plaintiff's claim arises under federal law. Defendant properly removed the claim to this Court, 28 U.S.C. 1441(c). The Court, therefore, declines to remand Count 4 and enters judgment for Defendant on that claim. The Court dismisses the remaining state law claims without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's motion for a prejudgment remedy #5 is moot. The Clerk is directed to close this matter upon entry of the judgment for Defendant on Count 4. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/03/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by James Doe.Responses due by 9/23/2020 (Ferry, Kevin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why Count 4 of the Second Amended Complaint should not be dismissed and the remaining claims dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's response is due 09/11/2020. Defendant's response is due within 14 days of Plaintiff's response. Please see the attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/20/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Bruce J Bemer of Signed Statement Following Removal (Barry, Ryan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Green on behalf of Bruce J Bemer (Green, Marina)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy filed by James Doe, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bruce J Bemer, #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Bruce J Bemer, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Bruce J Bemer, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Bruce J Bemer. Signed by Clerk on 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/4/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/4/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/4/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2020. Discovery due by 2/3/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/10/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/4/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by James Doe pending in state court at time of removal. (Walker, J.)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Bruce J Bemer Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Pending Motions)(Barry, Ryan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Barry on behalf of Bruce J Bemer (Barry, Ryan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bruce J Bemer Civil Cover Sheet (Barry, Ryan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bruce J Bemer from Superior Court of Connecticut, Judicial District of Hartford, case number HHD-CV19-5062220-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6012749, filed by Bruce J Bemer. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Attachments)(Barry, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Bemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Doe
Represented By: Kevin Ferry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce J Bemer
Represented By: Ryan P. Barry
Represented By: Marina Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?