Veach v. Walmart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Angela Veach
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. and Walmart Real Estate Business Trust
Case Number: 3:2020cv01125
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Lewis, D)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting absent objection #10 Motion to Remand to State Court. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/16/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 18, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/21/2020 (Lewis, D)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Angela Veach.Responses due by 9/8/2020 (DePalma, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Standing Protective Order, #8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2020. Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/12/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Lai, Janice)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Lai, Janice)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. Statement of No Pending Motions (Lai, Janice)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc. from New Haven Superior Court, case number NNH-CV20-6106245-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6018017, filed by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart, Inc..(Lai, Janice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veach v. Walmart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Veach
Represented By: Christopher D. DePalma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Janice D. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Janice D. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Janice D. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?