Sterling v. Carnival Corporation & PLC
Plaintiff: Suraya Sterling
Defendant: Carnival Corporation & PLC and Carnival Cruise Line
Case Number: 3:2020cv01142
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Suraya Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Exhibit #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff Suraya Sterling, #3 Exhibit Exhibit #2 Plaintiffs Hartford Healthcare Midstate Medical Center Medical Records, #4 Exhibit Exhibit #3 Notice of Claim and/or Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit #4 Defendants Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Complaint)(Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Carnival Corporation & PLC.Responses due by 10/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maurice Vega, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Perrone, Joseph)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation & PLC identifying Other Affiliate Carnival Corporation & PLC, Other Affiliate Carnival Cruise Line for Carnival Corporation & PLC. (Perrone, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Perrone on behalf of Carnival Corporation & PLC and Carnival Cruise Line (Perrone, Joseph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Suraya Sterling. Carnival Corporation & PLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carnival Corporation & PLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ikechukwu Umeugo* *Umeugo & Assoc.* *620 Boston Post Rd., PO Box 26373* *West Haven, CT 06516*. (Fazekas, J.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Suraya Sterling, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/11/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2020. Discovery due by 2/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
August 10, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Carnival Corporation & PLC. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu) Modified to correct party on 8/10/2020 (Hushin, Z.).
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation & PLC( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6023208.), filed by Suraya Sterling.(Umeugo, Ikechukwu) Modified to correct party on 8/10/2020 (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling v. Carnival Corporation & PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation & PLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Line
Represented By: Joseph J. Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suraya Sterling
Represented By: Ikechukwu Umeugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?