Lopresti v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dianne Lopresti
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01172
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Craven, James)
October 7, 2020 Answer deadline updated for C.R. Bard, Inc. to 11/13/2020. (Johnson, D.)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Defendant's (ECF No. #13 ) motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is GRANTED. The response shall be filed by November 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/7/2020. (Gait, Emily)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 13, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint by C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Craven, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Norman-Schiff on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (Norman-Schiff, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Craven on behalf of C.R. Bard, Inc. (Craven, James)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 09/28/2020. (Peterson, M)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rebecca Fredona to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6118483) by Dianne Lopresti. (Perkins, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The motion (ECF No. #7 ) is DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/15/2020. (Gait, Emily)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rebecca Fredona to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6087324) by Dianne Lopresti. (Perkins, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *C.R. Bard, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan Perkins* *Perkins & Associates, PC* *30 Lucy Street* *Woodbridge, CT 06525*. (Peterson, M)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Dianne Lopresti, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/13/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/13/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2020. Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 13, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
August 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Perkins, Jonathan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6030253.), filed by Dianne Lopresti.(Perkins, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopresti v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: James O. Craven
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Lopresti
Represented By: Jonathan Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?