Rocca v. USA
Plaintiff: Joseph Rocca
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv01182
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Clifford J. Grandjean* *Kennedy, Johnson, Schwab & Roberge, LLC* *555 Long Wharf Drive 13th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Freberg, B)
August 24, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to USA. (Grandjean, Clifford)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Rocca, #4 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2020; Discovery due by 2/13/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 14, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6033231.), filed by Joseph Rocca.(Grandjean, Clifford) Modified on 8/14/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocca v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Rocca
Represented By: Clifford J. Grandjean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?