Aplicano v. Siew
Plaintiff: Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano
Defendant: Ah Cheng Siew
Case Number: 3:2020cv01194
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER:discovery due by 4/30/2021; dispositive motions due by 5/7/2021; trial brief due by 6/4/2021; trial ready date 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/09/20. (Codeanne, K.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cates, Brittany)
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT re 17 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,, Signed By Carlton Mosley filed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Cates, Brittany)
October 6, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT re 17 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,,, Signed By Sonia Sanjay Khandekar filed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Cates, Brittany)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re 16 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Signed By Jesse Sherrett filed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Cates, Brittany)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacey Van Malden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6080225) by Ah Cheng Siew. (Van Malden, Stacey)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the #14 and #15 motions for pro hac vice admission of attorney Sonia Sanjay Khandekar and attorney Carlton Mosley, respectively. Attorney Khandekar and attorney Mosley shall file, in accordance with the District of Connecticut Local R. of Civ. P. 83.1(d)(1)(a), an affidavit indicating a fax number on or before October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/24/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #13 motion for pro hac vice admission of attorney Jesse D. H. Sherrett. Attorney Sherrett shall file, in accordance with the District of Connecticut Local R. of Civ. P. 83.1(d)(1)(a) and (b), an affidavit indicating a fax number and listing the corresponding bar identification number(s) for the bar memberships listed or, if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating it, on or before October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/24/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carlton Mosley to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6108437) by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Carlton Mosley, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cates, Brittany)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sonia Sanjay Khandekar to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6108428) by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sonia Sanjay Khandekar, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cates, Brittany)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jesse D.H. Sherrett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6108389) by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jesse Sherrett, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cates, Brittany)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in further support of Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice Signed By Stacey Van Malden filed by Ah Cheng Siew. (Van Malden, Stacey)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Ah Cheng Siew.(Van Malden, Stacey)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the #9 motion for pro hac vice admission of attorney Stacey Van Malden. Attorney Stacey Van Malden shall file, in accordance with the District of Connecticut Local R. of Civ. P. 83.1(d)(1)(b), an affidavit listing the corresponding bar identification number(s) for the bar memberships listed or, if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating it, on or before September 25, 2020. Attorney Stacey Van Malden shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before November 10, 2020. Upon the filing of the afore mentioned items, the court grants Attorney Frank Riccios request to be excused from attendance in court and participation in other proceedings before the court. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/11/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacey Van Malden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6080225) by Ah Cheng Siew. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Riccio, Frank)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Riccio, II on behalf of Ah Cheng Siew (as local counsel) (Riccio, Frank)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thomas Faxon on behalf of Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano (Faxon, Joel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. Ah Cheng Siew served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Cates, Brittany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ah Cheng Siew* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brittany S. Cates* *Faxon Law Group, LLC* *59 Elm St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Bozek, M.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #1 Complaint filed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/17/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020. Discovery due by 2/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 17, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
August 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ah Cheng Siew. (Cates, Brittany)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ah Cheng Siew ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6036061.), filed by Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cates, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aplicano v. Siew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Wilfredo Perez Aplicano
Represented By: Brittany S. Cates
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ah Cheng Siew
Represented By: Stacey Anne Van Malden
Represented By: Frank J. Riccio, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?