Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v. Greystone Home Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Kristen Pinsonneault and Judith Caruso and Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.
Defendant: Greystone Home Services, LLC. and Greystone Home Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01197
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
October 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/4/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Joint Trial Memorandumjdue by 10/15/2021. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #15 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by September 1, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 1, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by October 31, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by October 15, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on June 4, 2021 at 3:00 pm. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/13/2020. (DeBot, B.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blackburn, Stuart)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses. by Greystone Home Services, LLC.(Apuzzo, Jeffery)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Greystone Home Services, LLC. (Apuzzo, Jeffery)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery P. Apuzzo on behalf of Greystone Home Services, LLC (Apuzzo, Jeffery)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.. Greystone Home Services, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Blackburn, Stuart)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greystone Home Services, LLC, filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co..(Blackburn, Stuart)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR (Duplicative to Doc. #7)) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint against a limited liability company. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members, rather than by the state of incorporation and principal place of business. See, e.g., Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify the citizenship of each of the members of the defendant limited liability company. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 25, 2020, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the limited liability company defendant. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 08/19/2020. (DeBot, B.) Modified on 8/19/2020 (Freberg, B).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint against a limited liability company. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members, rather than by the state of incorporation and principal place of business. See, e.g., Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify the citizenship of each of the members of the defendant limited liability company. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 25, 2020, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the limited liability company defendant. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/19/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greystone Home Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Freberg, B)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020; Discovery due by 2/16/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 17, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Greystone Home Services, LLC.. (Blackburn, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greystone Home Services, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6036506.), filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.(Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 8/18/2020 to update party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co. v. Greystone Home Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Home Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Home Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffery P. Apuzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Kristen Pinsonneault and Judith Caruso
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?