Johnson v. Quiros
Petitioner: Johnny Johnson
Respondent: Angel Quiros
Case Number: 3:2020cv01199
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Petitioner's MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Johnny Johnson. (Velez, F.)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the sealing of Plaintiff's [10-2] Exhibits 1 and 2 in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5(e)3. This order is based on the Court's finding that the materials to be sealed contain confidential information concerning Defendant's medical condition. See Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (HIPAA); Local R. Civ. P. 5(e)3 ("A statute mandating or permitting the non-disclosure of a class of documents (e.g., personnel files, health care records, or records of administrative proceedings) provides sufficient authority to support an order sealing such documents.") (emphasis added). The confidentiality of medical records outweighs the public's right to know. See Northrop v. Carucci, No. 3:04CV103 (RNC), 2007 WL 685173, at *3 (D. Conn. Mar. 5, 2007) ("[F]ederal law treats medical records as confidential.") (citing HIPAA). The Clerk is directed to seal [10-2] exhibits 1 and 2 to Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/10/2020. (Nault, James)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Petitioner's Response To The Court's Order #7 to Show Cause, by Johnny Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 and 2) (Velez, F.)
August 31, 2020 Reset deadline: Show Cause Response is now due by 10/3/2020 per Dkt. 9 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Petititoner's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's #7 Order to Show Cause until 10/3/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/31/2020. (Nault, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 Petitioner's MOTION for Englargement of Time until 10/3/20 re #7 Order to Show Cause, by Johnny Johnson. (Velez, F.)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: State Court Remedies. Petitioner is directed to show cause why this petition should not be dismissed for failure to exhaust state court remedies. Petitioner shall file his response by 9/10/2020. See attached Order. Show Cause Response due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/21/2020. (Nault, James)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER sealing document. Petitioner submitted a request for release, Dkt. 1, with attached medical record. Dkt. 1-1. The Clerk is directed to seal Dkt. 1-1 in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5(e)3. This order is based on the Court's finding that the materials to be sealed contain confidential information concerning Defendant's medical condition. See Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 (HIPAA); Local R. Civ. P. 5(e)3 ("A statute mandating or permitting the non-disclosure of a class of documents (e.g., personnel files, health care records, or records of administrative proceedings) provides sufficient authority to support an order sealing such documents.") (emphasis added). The confidentiality of medical records outweighs the public's right to know. See Northrop v. Carucci, No. 3:04CV103 (RNC), 2007 WL 685173, at *3 (D. Conn. Mar. 5, 2007) ("[F]ederal law treats medical records as confidential.") (citing HIPAA). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/18/2020. (Nault, James)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/18/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/18/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re Habeas Corpus Filing Fee. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Motion for Compassionate Release -- First Step Act, filed by Johnny Johnson. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Envelope) (Velez, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angel Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnny Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?