Moore v. C R Bard Incorporated, et al
Plaintiff: Lecia Moore
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100 inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01201
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated with Certificate of Service (Brown, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6060123) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Matthew)
September 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/14/2020 (Tooker, Aimee)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Stay; granting #39 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/14/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines [correction made to caption only] by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Stipulation of Dismissal to term party McKesson Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 09/10/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party McKesson Corporation without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew E. Brown. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6060123) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation with certificate of service (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE Signed by Clerk on 08/19/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2020 Discovery due by 2/17/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2021 Signed by Clerk on 08/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 26 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02232. Modified on 8/19/2020 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #22 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Kawanda Coleman's case be severed and transferred to the Baton Rouge Division of the Middle District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2227-S); b. Plaintiff Deborah Gaylor's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2228-S); c. Plaintiff Gary Gross's case be severed and transferred to the Jefferson City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2229-S); d. Plaintiff Teresa Kearney's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2230-S); e. Plaintiff Gary Long's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2231-S); f. Plaintiff Lecia Moore's case be severed and transferred to the Hartford Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2232-S); g. Plaintiff Katherine Ringle's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2233-S); h. Plaintiff Margaret Slocum's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2234-S); i. Plaintiff Jeff Waller's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2235-S). Plaintiff Amanda Kozma is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Schulte, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1496-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/9/2020) (ctf)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900563) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued- Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. C R Bard Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecia Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?