Brown v. Ruiz et al
Plaintiff: Kenya Brown
Defendant: Debra Cruz, John Doe, II, Deborah Broadly, John Doe, I, Ricardo Ruiz, Jean Caplin and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv01202
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/28/20. (Payton, R.)
August 20, 2020 ENTERED IN ERROR - Docket Entry Correction re #3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR AND REDOCKETED AS DOC #7; THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED (Oliver, T.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Oliver, T.).
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 PRISCS - Prisoner Authorization Form by Kenya Brown. (REPLACING DOC #3) (Oliver, T.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/18/2020.(Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/18/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenya Brown. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 8/20/2020 (Oliver, T.). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.). Modified on 8/20/2020 TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF TO THE ENTRY (Oliver, T.).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenya Brown. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - OPERATIVE COMPLAINT against Deborah Broadly, Jean Caplin, Debra Cruz, John Doe, I, John Doe, II, Ricardo Ruiz, filed by Kenya Brown.(Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ruiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Broadly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Caplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?