Han v. Ming Jiang Services Corp et al
Plaintiff: Gen Wang Han
Defendant: Qiao Mei Liu, Wen Hui Wang, Jian Rong Liu, Nicky Wang, Nick Wang, Qiao Mei Wang, Qiao Mei Liu Wang, Cindy Liu Wang, Ming Jiang Services Corp doing business as Yokohama, Cindy Liu, Cindy Wang and Michael Wang
Case Number: 3:2020cv01206
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Set deadline: joint trial memorandum due by 9/6/2021 per Dkt. 22. (Shafer, J.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 4/21/2021 at 4:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are to dial 888-251-2909 and enter 2429024# as the access code. (Shafer, J.)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following case management deadlines in light of the parties #21 Rule 26(f) Report. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 4/21/2021 at 4:00 pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 7/5/2021. Dispositive motions are due by 8/5/2021. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 9/6/2021, and jury selection will take place on 10/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 4/5/2022, and jury selection will take place on 5/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the jury trial is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #8 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket.Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/13/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gen Wang Han. Wen Hui Wang served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gen Wang Han. Michael Wang served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gen Wang Han. Ming Jiang Services Corp served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gen Wang Han. Qiao Mei Liu served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gen Wang Han. Jian Rong Liu served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Troy, John)
September 25, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 10/26/2020 per Dkt. 15 Order. (Shafer, J.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/26/2020 to file an answer or responsive pleadings for good cause shown, this is the defendants' first motion for extension of time, counsel for the defendants was recently hired and requires additional time to properly respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/25/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2020 to file an answer #1 Complaint,, #10 Electronic Summons Issued, by Jian Rong Liu, Qiao Mei Liu, Ming Jiang Services Corp, Michael Wang, Wen Hui Wang. (Hang, Jian)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Jian Rong Liu, Qiao Mei Liu, Ming Jiang Services Corp, Michael Wang, Wen Hui Wang (Hang, Jian)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Striking #4 Notice of Appearance by Aaron B. Schweitzer. On 8/24/2020, the Court ordered Mr. Schweitzer to supplement his Notice of Appearance within 48 hours with proof of admission to the Bar of the District of Connecticut. Mr. Schwietzer has failed to do so. The Clerk is directed to remove Aaron Schweitzer as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/28/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Aaron Schweitzer to supplement the Notice of Appearance #4 filed on August 19, 2020 with proof of admission to the Bar of the District of Connecticut within 48 hours of this order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/24/2020. (Burlingham, Corinne).
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jian Rong Liu, Qiao Mei Liu, Ming Jiang Services Corp, Michael Wang, Wen Hui Wang* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Troy* *Troy Law, PLLC* *41-25 Kissena Blvd., Suite 103* *Flushing, NY 11355*. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Gen Wang Han, #7 Standing Protective Order, #3 Exhibit filed by Gen Wang Han, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Gen Wang Han, #2 Exhibit filed by Gen Wang Han, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/19/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/19/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/19/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2020; Discovery due by 2/18/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 19, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron B. Schweitzer on behalf of Gen Wang Han (Schweitzer, Aaron)
August 19, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Jian Rong Liu, Qiao Mei Liu, Ming Jiang Services Corp, Michael Wang, Wen Hui Wang. (Troy, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Gen Wang Han re #1 Complaint,. (Troy, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet by Gen Wang Han. (Troy, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jian Rong Liu, Qiao Mei Liu, Ming Jiang Services Corp, Michael Wang, Wen Hui Wang ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6040542.), filed by Gen Wang Han. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Document Preservation Demand, #2 Exhibit 02 Notice of Lien and Assignment (40%), #3 Exhibit 03 Notice that Retaliation is Illegal under the FLSA and CTMWA, #4 Exhibit 04 Notice Settlement Under the Table is Prohibited)(Troy, John) Modified on 8/19/2020 to correct parties(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Han v. Ming Jiang Services Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiao Mei Liu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wen Hui Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Rong Liu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicky Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiao Mei Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiao Mei Liu Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Liu Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Jiang Services Corp doing business as Yokohama
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Liu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wang
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gen Wang Han
Represented By: Aaron B. Schweitzer
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?