Dean v. Carroll
Plaintiff: Mark H Dean
Defendant: Patrick L. Carroll, III.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01212
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark H Dean (Weinstein, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick L. Carroll, III, filed by Mark H Dean.(Weinstein, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Patrick L. Carroll, III to 9/25/2020, per Order #8. (Fanelle, N.)
September 4, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Patrick L. Carroll, III to 9/11/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order granting on consent #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before September 25, 2020. If the Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint, the Defendant shall respond "within the time remaining to respond to the original pleading or within 14 days after service of the amended pleading, whichever is later." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/3/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2020 To Answer #1 Complaint by Patrick L. Carroll, III. (Nunley, Alma)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alma Rose Nunley on behalf of Patrick L. Carroll, III (Nunley, Alma)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Patrick L. Carroll III on 8-21-2020, filed by Mark H Dean. (Weinstein, Richard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Patrick L. Carroll, III* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Richard P. Weinstein* *Weinstein & Wisser, P.C* *29 S. Main St, Suite 207* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Fanelle, N.)
August 20, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Patrick L. Carroll, III. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick L. Carroll, III, filed by Mark H Dean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark H Dean
Represented By: Richard P. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick L. Carroll, III.
Represented By: Alma Rose Nunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?