Perrouna v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patricia Perrouna
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01216
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #12 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by June 18, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by July 26, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by August 18, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by September 2, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on March 19, 2021 at 3:30 PM. Parties shall call 877-402-9753; access code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/11/2020.(Gutierrez, Y.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Han, Young)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Young B. Han on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Han, Young)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Service Documents,, (Han, Young)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Answer to Complaint filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Freberg, B)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/20/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/20/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020; Discovery due by 2/19/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2020.(Freberg, B)
August 20, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Han, Young)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Han, Young)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Han, Young)
August 20, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. OF PENDING MOTIONS (Han, Young)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from J.D. District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV-20-6099013-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6043906, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Han, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrouna v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Perrouna
Represented By: Jeremy G. Vishno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?