Mahmood v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Faria Mahmood
Defendant: Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01230
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neborsky, Dawn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Claim by Target Corporation.(Neborsky, Dawn)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter James Brown on behalf of Faria Mahmood (Brown, Peter)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Target Corporation, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Target Corporation, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Target Corporation, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Target Corporation Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Peterson, M)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/21/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/21/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/20/2020. Discovery due by 2/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2021. Signed by Clerk on 08/21/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Certification of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Target Corporation (Civil Miscellaneous Notices and Orders) (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Target Corporation (No Pending Motions in State Court) (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Corporation (Neborsky, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores, Inc. from Hartford at Hartford, case number HHD-CV-20-6130819-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6046598, filed by Target Corporation d/b/a Target Stores, Inc..(Neborsky, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahmood v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faria Mahmood
Represented By: Peter James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation doing business as Target Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?