Gallego v. Powell et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Gallego
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc., Kevin M. Powell and ArcBest Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv01264
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following dial in information for the call. Call in 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER:Please read full text of attached Order. Discovery due by 10/31/2021; Initial Status Report due by 11/1/2020; Prefiling Conference Request Re: Dispositive Motions due 9/16/2021; Settlement Conference 11/2021; Trial Ready Date 1/15/2022; Trial Brief due by 11/30/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/1/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kenney, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for ArcBest Corporation; Corporate Parent ArcBest Corporation, Corporate Parent ABF, Inc. for ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Electronic Service Documents,, Response to 6-1 - Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation, Kevin M. Powell. (Kenney, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by ArcBest Corporation, ABF Freight System, Inc., Kevin M. Powell, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ArcBest Corporation, ABF Freight System, Inc., Kevin M. Powell. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/27/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/27/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2020, Discovery due by 2/26/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 27, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by ABF Freight System, Inc., ArcBest Corporation, Kevin M. Powell Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ArcBest Corporation, ABF Freight System, Inc., Kevin M. Powell from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New London, case number KNL-CV20-6047859-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6059736, filed by ArcBest Corporation, ABF Freight System, Inc., Kevin M. Powell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of Removal filed in State Court))(Kenney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallego v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Powell
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ArcBest Corporation
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Gallego
Represented By: John J. Nazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?