Davitt v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Davitt
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01280
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated with Certificate of Service (Brown, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6068955) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Matthew)
September 10, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 11/9/2020 (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 JOINT MOTION TO STAY AND FOR FILING OF STATUS REPORT. The Court GRANTS the parties joint motion for a 90-day stay, and the parties shall file a status report 60 days from now on November 9, 2020. It is so ordered.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 09/10/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 9, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party McKesson Corporation without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2020 Discovery due by 3/3/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2021 Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/31/2020. (Freberg, B)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6068955) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation with Certificate of Service (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Hushin, Z.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 26 Case Electronically transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02546. Modified on 9/1/2020 to correct file date (Hushin, Z.).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #19 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Theresa Beeler's case be severed and transferred to the Tulsa Division of the Northern District of Oklahoma (Civil case 3:20-cv-2545 opened); b. Plaintiff Margaret Davitt's case be severed and transferred to the New Haven Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2546 opened); c. Plaintiff Michael Harris's case be severed and transferred to the Central Islip Division of the Eastern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2547 opened); d. Plaintiff Sallie King's case be severed and transferred to the Valdosta Division of the Middle District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2548 opened); e. Plaintiff Brian McCaslin's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2549 opened); f. Plaintiff James Shoop's case be severed and transferred to the Central Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2550 opened); g. Plaintiff Dorothy Stamer's case be severed and transferred to the Western Division of the Southern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2551 opened); and h. Plaintiff Richard Wawrzyniak's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2552 opened). Plaintiff Tommie Byers is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/27/2020) (jmg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Terry Scott's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. Party Terry Scott terminated. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/25/2020) (axm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa) Modified title on 8/25/2020 (awc).
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Matthews, Melissa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Theresa Beeler, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Theresa Beeler, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak re #19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever Claims of Non-Texas Plaintiffs, MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division () filed by Theresa Beeler, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Theresa Beeler, Tommie Byers, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Theresa Beeler, Tommie Byers, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Theresa Beeler, Tommie Byers, Margaret Davitt, Michael Harris, Sallie King, Brian McCaslin, Terry Scott, James Shoop, Dorothy Stamer, Richard Wawrzyniak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1535-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/11/2020) (ctf)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10907842) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 2020-04-06 Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 2020-04-06 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 2020-04-06 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 2020-04-06 Citation Issues - C.R. Bard, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 2020-05-06 Return of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 2020-06-04 Return of Service Bard Peripheral) (Jarreau, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davitt v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Davitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?