Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Eyal Desheh, Sigurdur Olafsson, Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V., Deborah Griffin, Michael Mcclellan, Yitzhak Peterburg, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Erez Vigodman and Kare Schultz
Not Classified By Court: Sandoz, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01283
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs And Sandoz Regarding Sandozs Document Production Ordered by the Court by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Fonti, Joseph)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. The parties shall file another joint status report by, at the latest, December 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/16/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT October 15, 2020 Joint Status Report By Plaintiffs And Sandoz Regarding Sandozs Document Production Ordered By The Court by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Fonti, Joseph)
September 10, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/10/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/1/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2020; taking under advisement #31 Motion to Compel; taking under advisement #32 Motion to Quash; re #31 MOTION to Compel filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, #32 MOTION to Quash REFILING OF MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER TO THIS DISTRICT filed by Sandoz, Inc. Total Time: 1 hours and 36 minutes(Court Reporter Masse. S.) (Jaiman, R.)
August 13, 2020 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Motion Hearing scheduled for August 28, 2020 at 10:00 am will be conducted via Zoom (and in person). The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612020126?pwd=aFpFcGdGbGRJc00zdVNKSlRzckJOZz09 and the call-in number is +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York).Meeting ID: 161 202 0126 Meeting Password: 749085Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The hearing will also be accessible via Zoom, and that access information will be provided on the docket soon. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 7, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Quash REFILING OF MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER TO THIS DISTRICT by Sandoz, Inc..Responses due by 8/28/2020 (Rogers, Margaret)
August 5, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to COMPEL by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board of Refiling of Motion to Compel Pending at the Time of Transfer to This District (Fonti, Joseph) Modified on 8/6/2020 TO CORRECT THE EVENT TYPE (Oliver, T.).
August 5, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Burry on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Burry, Benjamin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Thayne Stoddard on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Stoddard, Thayne)
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan A. Kubota on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Kubota, Evan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Fonti on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Fonti, Joseph)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/3/2020.(Jaiman, R.)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/30/2020.(Bozek, M.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 ENTERED IN ERROR - Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 7/30/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 to enter in error (Agati, Kathryn).
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 to enter in error (Agati, Kathryn).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 to enter in error (Agati, Kathryn).
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 ENTERED IN ERROR - Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2020, Discovery due by 1/28/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) Modified on 7/30/2020 to enter in error (Agati, Kathryn).
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-mc-00213.
July 15, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Connecticut.(ama) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ama).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this action is transferred to the District of Connecticut pursuant to Rule 45(f). Sandoz Inc. has minimal interest in litigating the pending motions before the undersigned and will not be burdened by the transfer. The Court therefore finds that Sandoz Inc.'s interest in "local" resolution is outweighed by the need to avoid inconsistent rulings on what evidence would be relevant to Plaintiffs' claims in the underlying litigation -a prospect that is particularly prominent in complex litigation of this nature. The Court further finds that judicial economy favors a transfer, rather than an attempt by this Court to divine Judge Underhill's view of the scope of the underlying litigation from his recent rulings. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to effectuate the transfer after seven days, inaccordance with Local Civil Rule 83.1. SO ORDERED., Motions terminated: #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00, filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, #9 MOTION to Quash OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY. filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/09/2020) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
July 3, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Margaret A. Rogers dated July 3, 2020 re: Plaintiffs' Letter dated June 29, 2020. Document filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L).(Rogers, Margaret)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Joseph A. Fonti dated June 29, 2020 re: In re Teva Securities Litigation, No. 1:20-mc-00213. Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Fonti, Joseph)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Margaret A. Rogers dated June 15, 2020 re: [Proposed] Order. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Rogers, Margaret)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Quash OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY . . Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Rogers, Margaret)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00, and in Opposition to Sandoz's Motion to Quash or Modify the Subpoena, and for Costs to Comply). Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Fonti, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Margaret A. Rogers in Support re: #9 MOTION to Quash OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY ., #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00,. Document filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K).(Rogers, Margaret)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #9 MOTION to Quash OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY . and in Opposition to #1 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Rogers, Margaret)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash OR MODIFY THE SUBPOENA, AND FOR COSTS TO COMPLY . Document filed by Sandoz Inc...(Rogers, Margaret)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Anne Rogers on behalf of Sandoz Inc...(Rogers, Margaret)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Compel and Supporting Documents; Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet served on Sandoz Inc. on May 22, 2020. Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Fonti, Joseph)
May 26, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
May 26, 2020 MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. .(laq)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Asher Kubota on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Kubota, Evan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Francis Burry on behalf of Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Burry, Benjamin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Fonti in Support re: #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00,. Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Sandoz, #2 Exhibit B - Sandoz Responses and Objections, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Feb 19 Email, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs Mar 5 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Sandoz May 15 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs May 18 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Sandoz May 20 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Sandoz DPA, #10 Exhibit J Part 1 - State AGs Complaint, #11 Exhibit J Part 2 - State AGs Complaint, #12 Exhibit J Part 3 - State AGs Complaint, #13 Exhibit J Part 4 - State AGs Complaint, #14 Exhibit J Part 5 - State AGs Complaint, #15 Exhibit J Part 6 - State AGs Complaint).(Fonti, Joseph)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00, . Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board..(Fonti, Joseph)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Fonti, Joseph)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Sandoz Inc. to Produce Documents. Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Connecticut. Other Court Case Number: 3:17-cv-000558 (SRU). (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19938841)Document filed by Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board.(Fonti, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board
Represented By: Joseph A. Fonti
Represented By: Benjamin Burry
Represented By: Evan A. Kubota
Represented By: Thayne Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anchorage Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Joseph A. Fonti
Represented By: Benjamin Burry
Represented By: Evan A. Kubota
Represented By: Thayne Stoddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Finance Netherlands III B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mcclellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yitzhak Peterburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kare Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?