Baribeau v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Yvon R. Baribeau
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01290
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Hartford Life, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Tomasco, Jean)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Elizabeth Tomasco on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Tomasco, Jean)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020 filed by Yvon R. Baribeau. (Ramos, Ivan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Yvon R. Baribeau Signed by Clerk on 09/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 09/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 09/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020. Discovery due by 3/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2021. Signed by Clerk on 09/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
September 2, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6070015.), filed by Yvon R. Baribeau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramos, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baribeau v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvon R. Baribeau
Represented By: Ivan A. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?