USA v. Andrews et al
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: Ellery E. Andrews, Jeffrey Andrews, Lynn Cooke Andrews, Wesley W. Andrews, Colton C. Andrews and Colton C Andrews
Case Number: 3:2020cv01300
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/16/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. The court will issue a Notice to Counsel by 12/1/2020 if this will be changed to an evidentiary hearing. (DeRubeis, B.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. Defendants' response to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 11/2/2020; government's reply due by 11/16/2020. The court will hold a hearing on 12/16/2020 on plaintiff's Motion. The court will determine if the hearing will be evidentiary or oral argument by December 1. Separate calendar will enter. The parties are to submit witness lists corresponding to submitted affidavits and exhibit lists by 11/23/2020; any objections to these filings are due by December 1. Total time: 15 minutes. (Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Redding Cofer Cates on behalf of USA (Cates, Redding)
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/8/2020 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (DeRubeis, B.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 10/31/2020 (Lewis, D)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2020 to File Responses to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/5/2020. (Lewis, D)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2020 to File Responses to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint filed by USA. (Thidemann, Anne)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2020 to File Responses to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint by Colton C Andrews, Ellery E. Andrews, Jeffrey Andrews, Lynn Cooke Andrews, Wesley W. Andrews. (Baird, Rachel)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Baird on behalf of Colton C Andrews, Ellery E. Andrews, Jeffrey Andrews, Lynn Cooke Andrews, Wesley W. Andrews (Baird, Rachel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. All Defendants. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Ellery E. Andrews served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Colton C Andrews served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Wesley W. Andrews served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Lynn Cooke Andrews served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Jeffrey Andrews served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Thidemann, Anne)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Grillot on behalf of USA (Grillot, Benjamin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by USA.Responses due by 9/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Stokely Declaration, #4 Exhibit Stokely Exhibit A, #5 Affidavit Putnam Declaration, #6 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit O, #21 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit P, #22 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit Q, #23 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit R, #24 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit S, #25 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit T, #26 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit U, #27 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit V, #28 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit W, #29 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit X, #30 Exhibit Putnam Exhibit Y)(Thidemann, Anne)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anne F. Thidemann* *U.S. Attorney's Office-BPT* *1000 Lafayette Blvd., 10th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/2/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/2/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/2/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020. Discovery due by 3/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Site Map)(Thidemann, Anne)
September 2, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Thidemann, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Andrews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellery E. Andrews
Represented By: Rachel M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Andrews
Represented By: Rachel M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Cooke Andrews
Represented By: Rachel M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley W. Andrews
Represented By: Rachel M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton C. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton C Andrews
Represented By: Rachel M. Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Anne F. Thidemann
Represented By: Redding Cofer Cates
Represented By: Benjamin Grillot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?