Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC v. Free People of PA LLC
Plaintiff: Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC
Defendant: Free People of PA LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01303
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER terminating as moot #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Motion is terminated in light of #19 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/2/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/2/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
October 2, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pesta, J.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of CASE JOINT/WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC. (Kaelin, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2020 to Respond to Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims in 11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/28/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2020 to Respond to Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims in #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC. (Kaelin, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant, Free People of PA, LLC, is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by October 1, 2020, why plaintiff's #15 Motion to Remand should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/17/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC.Responses due by 10/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Kaelin, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regency Centers, L.P., Other Affiliate Regency Centers Corporation for Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC, Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC. (Kaelin, Robert)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Ciarleglio on behalf of Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC (Ciarleglio, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Kaelin on behalf of Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC (Kaelin, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC by Free People of PA LLC.(Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Free People of PA LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Free People of PA LLC, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Free People of PA LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Free People of PA LLC, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Free People of PA LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #9 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Free People of PA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Urban Outfitters, Inc. for Free People of PA LLC. (Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Free People of PA LLC Notice of Pending Motions (Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Free People of PA LLC Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Masin on behalf of Free People of PA LLC (Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Free People of PA LLC from Connecticut Superior Court, case number NWH-CV20-6005917-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6072950, filed by Free People of PA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Masin, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC v. Free People of PA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity One (Westport Village Center) LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Kaelin
Represented By: Matthew A Ciarleglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free People of PA LLC
Represented By: Adam Michael Masin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?